Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Meyer, Tiffany, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Weisser, Kevin Joshua, against Security First Insurance Compa, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 31, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL- #202000001455 | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
January 13, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF DEFENDANTS DESIGNATED CORPORATE REPRESENTATIVE(S) | |
January 06, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DISCOVERY | |
December 19, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER REGARDING PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF DEFENDANT'S CORP REP DEPOSTION | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO ATTACH THE INSURANCE POLICY MOTION TO DISMISS COUNT II FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CAUSE OF ACTION OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE MOTION FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF WITHDRAWL AS TO COUNT II PETITION FOR DECLATORY RELIEF | |
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event | Response TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS | |
December 11, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.