Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Modlin, Scott Eric, against Rewis, Christopher, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 18, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Sworn Complaint
Date: October 18, 2019Stipulation OF SETTLEMENT
Date: June 19, 2020AGREED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT
Date: June 23, 2020Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 23, 2020 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSAL OF LAWSUIT | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation OF SETTLEMENT | |
June 19, 2020 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
February 28, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED CHRISTOPHER REWIS- 02/06/2020 AT 3:10 PM | |
February 24, 2020 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED- CHRISTOPHER CREWS- 02/06/2020 AT 3:10 PM | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Case 022019CA000120CAAXMX Filed with Clerk on 10/18/2019 | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED CHRISTOPHER REWIS | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Sworn Complaint | |
October 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Assessment 1 Total Assessed $410.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.