Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Td Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Burns, Danielle Rundlett, against Richardson, Kimberly (Tenant 1, Richardson, Tori (Unknown Tena, Richardson, Troy Michael, represented by Maloney, Frank Edward, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with CASON, JODI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASON, JODI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 14, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OLD NURSERY PLANTATION HOA REG AGENT RAMON ALONSO 9/11/19
Date: September 25, 2019ANSWER TO COMPLAINT
Date: September 11, 2019SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED BY SUB ON KIMBERLY RICHARDSON FOR TROY MICHAEL RICHARDSON 9/11/19
Date: September 25, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | HEARING FORM | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS | |
July 06, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS NON JURY TRIAL | |
April 20, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERKS CERTIFICATE OF MAILING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 7/7/2021 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
April 15, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:CASE MANAGEMENT set for 7/7/2021 at 1000 AM in MX with Judge JODI CASON | |
April 14, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS MOTION TO CONTINUE AND RE SETTING NON JURY TRIAL- WEDNESDAY JULY 07 2021 AT 10:00 AM | |
April 09, 2021 | Docket Event | Hearing Form | |
March 29, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CIVIL NON JURY TRAIL scheduled on 5/5/2021 at 1000 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.