Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Nationstar Mortgage Llc Dba Mr, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Concilio, Amy Lorraine, Fishman, Barry Stuart, against Battle, Andra, Cypress Pointe Of Macclenny Ho, Hyde, Robin, Peele, Kwame Rashad, Unknown Parties In Possession, (total of 6) See All represented by Edwards, Michael Ludolphe, Treadway, Shannon A, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with CASON, JODI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASON, JODI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 09, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-C |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Notice of Filing
Date: August 09, 2019CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: August 09, 2019MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER
Date: August 09, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER DISMISSING ACTION DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS VACATING JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- KWAME RASHAD PEELE | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- ROBIN HYDE | |
January 06, 2022 | Docket Event | ORIGINAL NOTE MAILED ON 01/06/2022 VIA FEDEX EXPRESS TO LOGS LEGAL GROUP LLP. TRACKING # 7756 7381 2932 | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER DISMISSING ACTION DISCHARGING LIS PENDENS VACATING JUDGMENT AND DIRECTING CLERK TO RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE- #202200000059 | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
December 23, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO DISMISS ACTION DISCHARGE LIS PENDENS VACATE JUDGMENT AND RETURN THE ORIGINAL NOTE | |
November 24, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- ANDRA BATTLE | |
November 17, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE | |
November 09, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO CANCEL FORECLOSURE SALE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.