Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Certain Underwriters At Lloyds, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Bowden, Jessie Elizabeth, against Phillips, Johnnie Jr, Tyson Foods Inc, represented by Howell, John Moffitt, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with GLORIA WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGLORIA WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 01, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Sworn Complaint
Date: August 01, 2019Notice of Filing SECRETARY OF STATE ACCEPTANCE CERTIFICATE
Date: November 14, 2019NOTICE OF SERVICE
Date: November 14, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 4/21/2022 at 1100 AM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding. | |
November 05, 2021 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:CASE MANAGEMENT set for 4/21/2022 at 1130 AM in MX with Judge GLORIA WALKER | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE- THURSDAY APRIL 21 2022 AT 11:30 AM | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT TYSON FOODS INCS PRIVILEGE LOG | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTING MEDIATION | |
June 09, 2021 | Docket Event | MOTION TO COMPEL | |
September 14, 2020 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME | |
August 10, 2020 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE OF THE FERNANDEZ TRIAL LAWYERS PA | |
July 07, 2020 | Docket Event | ORDER FOR MEDIATION HEARING TUESDAY SEPTEMBER 15 2020 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.