Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Smallwood, Zackary, filed a(n) General Creditor - Creditor case represented by Lewis, Adam Michael, against Universal Property And Casualt, represented by Urbanowicz, Jason Randal, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with GLORIA WALKER presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGLORIA WALKER Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Creditor |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE #201900006525 | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF DEPOSITION | |
August 15, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
August 14, 2019 | Docket Event | Deposition NOTICE OF TAKING DESPOSITION DUCES TECUM OF PLAINTIFF | |
August 12, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 10/24/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge GLORIA WALKER presiding. | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | Event Time Changed:CASE MANAGEMENT set for 10/24/2019 at 1100 AM in MX with Judge GLORIA WALKER | |
August 09, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE ADN REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT10/24/2019 AT 11:00 AM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.