Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Specialized Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Deluca, Orlando, against Bostic, Brittany, Bostic, Mason, Mortgage Electronic Registrati, Sands Pointe Homeowners Associ, Tenant 1, Unknown, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with CASON, JODI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASON, JODI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 17, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS #201900004394
Date: June 17, 2019VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLA
Date: June 17, 2019NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY DEFENDANT
Date: September 12, 2019Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- BRITTANY AND MASON BOSTIC | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- MASON BOSTIC | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- MASON BOSTIC | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL- BRITTANY BOSTIC | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF TITLE- #202100005843 | |
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENT | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SALE | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 Total Assessed $70.00 Balance Remaining $0.00 | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Assessment 2 assessed at sum $70.00 | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Payment received: $70.00 Receipt Number MX 2021003686 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.