Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Fidelity Bank Dba Fidelity Ban, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Anthousis, Julie, York, Julie, against James D Crummey Aka James Davi, Jennifer J Crummey Aka Jennife, Sandra Elizabeth Griffis, Unknown Spouse Of Sandra Eliza, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with CASON, JODI presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCASON, JODI Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 05, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 37-D |
Last RefreshedMarch 31, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND RELEASE OF LIS PENDENS #201900006834 | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | FINAL DISPOSITION FORM | |
September 24, 2019 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
September 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Event CASE MANAGEMENT scheduled on 11/6/2019 at 0900 AM, MX - Judge JODI CASON presiding. | |
September 20, 2019 | Docket Event | ORDER OF REFERRAL TO GENERAL MAGISTRATE - CIVIL ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND HEARING ON PENDING MOTIONS -11/06/2019 AT 9:00 AM | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing - AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT | |
August 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Filing AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY'S FEES AND TIME AND AFFIDAVIT OF ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED SANDRA GRIFFIS- 06/28/2019 AT 8:55 PM | |
July 22, 2019 | Docket Event | RETURN OF SERVICE - EXECUTED UNK SPOUSE OF SANDRA E GRIFFIS- 06/28/2019 AT 8:55 PM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.