Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Gilmore, Mary, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Burch, Daren Eugene, Leonards Express Inc, represented by Huttman, Laurence Craig, in the jurisdiction of Baker County, FL, . Baker County, FL Superior Courts with WALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWALKER, GLORIMIL ROSARIO Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2019 |
CategoryCircuit Civil 3-D |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationBaker County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CLOSING FILE- #202100008365 | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Case Status set to CLOSED | |
November 03, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
October 01, 2020 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE | |
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event | MOTION TO SET FOR TRIAL | |
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION | |
August 19, 2019 | Docket Event | Response TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES OF DEFENDANTS | |
August 01, 2019 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO PLAITNIFF |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.