Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Boruch, Alan V filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts with Toby S. Monaco presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeToby S. Monaco Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2018 |
CategoryDissolution Of Marriage |
Last RefreshedDecember 27, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 23, 2018 | Docket Event | 2ND AMENDED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
June 14, 2018 | Docket Event | AMENDED QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | COPY OF DRIVERS LICENSE OF CONSUELO S MAGGI (WIFE); | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | FINAL JUDGMENT OF DISSOLUTION OF MARRIAGE (CLOSES) | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | COPIES - FEE (COURT DOCUMENTS) Receipt: 414480 Date: 02/13/2018 | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | QUALIFIED DOMESTIC RELATIONS ORDER | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | HEARING DISPOSITION FORM | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION FEE Receipt: 414480 Date: 02/13/2018 | |
February 09, 2018 | Docket Event | ORDER CONTINUING FINAL HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.