Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
American Express National Bank As Successor By, filed a(n) General Torts - Torts case against Shields, Zachary J, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
CategoryCounty Money Damages Claim $15,001 To $30,000 |
Last RefreshedDecember 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Torts |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER FROM ALACHUA COUNTY CLERK TO ALL PARTIES REGARDING TRANSFER CASE RECEIVED (MAILED TO ALL PARTIES 9/3/2021/CMW) | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF PROGRESS DOCKET FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFIED COPY OF ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT RECEIPT FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
August 20, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT LETTER FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY CLERK TO ALACHUA COUNTY CLERK REGARDING TRANSFER FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
August 11, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT FROM PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY TO OKALOOSA COUNTY CLERK OF COURT FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT LETTER FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY CLERK TO PLAINTIFF FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT RECORDED EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
July 22, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT EX-PARTE ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY | |
July 19, 2021 | Docket Event | TRANSFER IN CASE DOCUMENT PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE AND PLAINTIFF'S EX-PARTE MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECTUATE SERVICE OF PROCESS FROM OKALOOSA COUNTY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.