Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Martinez, Narciso I, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Aman, Craig, Aman, Sarah J, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is a legal document filed in the Circuit Court of Florida, Eighth Judicial Circuit, in and for Alachua County, Florida. The plaintiff, Narciso I. Martinez, is seeking damages in excess of $30,000. The accident that led to this claim oc...
COMPLAINT Receipt: 474517 Date: 09/02/2021
Date: August 31, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: August 31, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL AS TO SARAH J AMAN ONLY | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE ON 12/30/2022 CRAIG AMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER TO SERVE OR DISMISS | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO CRAIG AMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
December 15, 2021 | Docket Event | 20 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED TO SARAH J AMAN (DEFENDANT); | |
December 10, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE AS SUMMONS DOES NOT COMPLY WITH FORM 1.902(b), FLORIDA RULES OF CIVIL PROCEDURE (INDIVIDUAL SUMMONS); ALL SUMMONSES AS TO INDIVIDUALS MUST NOW HAVE OUR NEW LOCAL ADA LANGUAGE (TRANSLATED ON SPANISH & FRENCH PAGES TOO) FOR CORRECT SUMMONS GO TO CLERK'S WEBSITE, CLICK ON "FORMS" THEN "CIVIL FORMS" THEN "SUMMONS FOR SERVICE ON INDIVIDUAL (WITH TRILINGUAL LANGUAGE)”; WHEN SUBMITTING CORRECT SUMMONS ON PORTAL CHOOSE "CORRECTED SUMMONS" AS THE $10 FEE HAS ALREADY BEEN PAID - CMW 12/14/2021) Receipt: 478684 Date: 12/14/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT Receipt: 474517 Date: 09/02/2021 | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.