Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Foote, Luann, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Sterling, Cheyne, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 30, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedDecember 13, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
COMPLAINT Receipt: 474426 Date: 08/31/2021
Date: August 30, 2021STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER PER A.O. 3.09
Date: August 30, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED - WITH FEE Receipt: 477194 Date: 11/04/2021 CHEYNE STERLING (DEFENDANT);
Date: November 02, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SCHEDULING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL FEBRUARY 20, 2023 3:30PM MARCH 6, 2023 9:00AM | |
March 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING SUBMISSION OF CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT - MARCH 22, 2022 @ 1:35PM | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351 | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF NON-OBJECTION IN COMPLIANCE WITH FLORIDA RULE OF CIVIL PROCEDURE 1.351 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.