Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Warren, Anthony, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Carrier, Riley, Carrier, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 13, 2021 |
CategoryNeg. - Other |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is a civil action filed by Anthony Warren against defendants Riley Carrier and Robert Carrier. The complaint alleges that on or about October 31, 2019, while Warren was walking near the 2500 block of Pensacola Street in Tallahassee, Fl...
CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: January 13, 2021COMPLAINT Receipt: 464749 Date: 01/14/2021
Date: January 13, 2021SUMMONS (CLERK UNABLE TO ISSUE. SUMMONS IS BLANK)
Date: January 21, 2021SUMMONS - ISSUED RILEY CARRIER (DEFENDANT);
Date: January 21, 202120 DAY SUMMONS ISSUED AS TO: ROBERT CARRIER (SUMMONS ISSUED ON 01/29/2021)
Date: January 28, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, ROBERT CARRIER
Date: February 25, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, RILEY CARRIER
Date: February 25, 2021PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT, RILEY CARRIER
Date: February 25, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT, ROBERT CARRIER
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF HEARING - 7/23/2021 @ 1:00 PM
Date: June 23, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFDENDANT, RILEY CARRIER
Date: February 25, 2021DEFENDANT'S MOTION FOR TRANSFER VENUE (REOPEN)
Date: March 22, 2021PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, ROBERT CARRIER
Date: February 25, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING
Date: July 23, 2021AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE
Date: July 23, 2021COVER LETTER WITH FEES ATTACHED
Date: August 06, 2021LETTER TRANSFERRING CIRCUIT CASE Sent on: 08/23/2021 10:22:17.20
Date: August 23, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | RECEIPT TRANSFER | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER TRANSFERRING CIRCUIT CASE Sent on: 08/23/2021 10:22:17.20 | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | ALERT ISSUED CASE TRANSFERRED - DO NOT DOCKET LINE ON CASE issued on: 08/23/2021 For: CARRIER, RILEY Bond Amt: Bond Type: | |
August 23, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
August 10, 2021 | Docket Event | POSTAGE FEE Receipt: 473556 Date: 08/11/2021 | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | COVER LETTER WITH FEES ATTACHED | |
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event | CLERK'S NOTE: CASE TO BE TRANSFERRED ON AUGUST 23, 2021 - $ 400.00 CHECK FOR LEON COUNTY RECEIVED AND IS IN LOCKED CABINET | |
July 29, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTER REQUESTING POSTAGE AND TRANSFER FEES (EMAILED TO PLAINTIFF'S ATTORNEY 7/29/2021 - ELH) | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO TRANSFER VENUE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.