Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Walker Ii, Robert Lee, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carlson Esq, David, against Central Florida Contractors Services Inc, Thompson, Rodney Darin, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the Eighth Judicial Circuit in Alachua County, Florida. The plaintiff, Robert Lee Walker II, is suing the defendants, Rodney Darin Thompson and Central Florida Contractors Services, Inc., for damages. T...
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 464715 Date: 01/13/2021
Date: January 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: January 12, 2021PLAINTIFF'S FIRST INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT CENTRAL FLORIDA CONTRACTORS SERVICES, INC
Date: January 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 26, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER OF DISMISSAL (CLOSES) | |
December 20, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND REQUEST TO REMOVE CASE FROM TRIAL DOCKET | |
December 14, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT - 12/13/21 - SETTLED | |
November 15, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATION OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | STIPULATION AS TO TRIAL TERM | |
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.