Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Johnson, Richantae A, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Mcneill Esq, Ryan, against Gainesville Florida City Of The, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 12, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed by Richantae A. Johnson against the City of Gainesville, Florida. The complaint alleges general negligence and seeks damages exceeding $30,000. The venue for this action is the Eighth Judicial Circuit in Alachua County, Florid...
COMPLAINT Receipt: 464712 Date: 01/13/2021
Date: January 12, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - DOES NOT STATE IF JURY TRIAL IS REQUESTED
Date: January 12, 2021E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516
Date: January 12, 2021CORRECTED COMPLAINT
Date: February 18, 2021SHERIFF'S RETURN SUMMONS - SERVED GAINESVILLE FLORIDA CITY OF THE (DEFENDANT);
Date: February 26, 2021E-MAIL DESIGNATION PER RULE 2.516
Date: March 29, 2021CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S ANSWER, DEFENSES AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO COMPLAINT
Date: March 29, 2021NOTICE OF CANCELLATION AND RESCHEDULING OF DEPOSITION - 09/15/21 AT 10:00 A.M.
Date: September 14, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: May 10, 2021CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: May 12, 2021CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S SUPPLEMENTAL RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST FOR PRODUCTION
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE
Date: August 12, 2021CITY OF GAINESVILLE'S CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 02, 2021PLAINTIFF, RICHANTAE JOHNSON'S, CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT
Date: September 02, 2021PLAINTIFF, RICHANTAE JOHNSON, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: September 14, 2021ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL
Date: September 22, 2021ORDER CANCELING
Date: September 22, 2021AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA ZOOM
Date: December 17, 2021NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE
Date: February 07, 2022NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: February 16, 2022DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY
Date: March 01, 2022PLAINTIFF'S TREATING DOCTORS AND NON-RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS LIST
Date: March 17, 2022PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 15, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 17, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S TREATING DOCTORS AND NON-RETAINED EXPERT WITNESS LIST | |
March 15, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR COPIES TO DEFENDANT | |
March 01, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY | |
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEO DEPOSITION | |
February 07, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE | |
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION DUCES TECUM VIA ZOOM | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER CANCELING | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION AND RESCHEDULING OF DEPOSITION - 09/15/21 AT 10:00 A.M. | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF, RICHANTAE JOHNSON, RESPONSE TO DEFENDANT'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.