Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Cone, Dylan T, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Carlson Esq, David, against Frederick, Annessa S, Hornbuckle, Evan R, in the jurisdiction of Alachua County. This case was filed in Alachua County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 07, 2021 |
CategoryAuto Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAlachua County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint is filed in the Circuit Court of the Eighth Judicial Circuit in Alachua County, Florida. The plaintiff, Dylan T. Cone, is suing the defendants, Evan R. Hornbuckle and Annessa S. Frederick, for damages in excess of $30,000. The complain...
COMPLAINT FOR DAMAGES AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL Receipt: 464494 Date: 01/07/2021
Date: January 07, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET - JURY TRIAL REQUESTED
Date: January 07, 2021PLAINTIFF'S INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ANNESSA S FREDERICK
Date: January 07, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
January 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE (CLOSES) | |
December 03, 2021 | Docket Event | MEDIATION DISPOSITION REPORT (FULL SETTLEMENT) | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL OF NON-OBJECTION | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF’S WAIVER OF 10-DAY NOTICE PERIOD FOR PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES | |
November 10, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SETTLEMENT AUTHORITY | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS' SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST TO PRODUCE | |
September 14, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S WAIVER OF 10-DAY NOTICE PERIOD FOR PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTIES AND REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.