Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Johnson, Donna J, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Virga, John E, against Kellymoore Paint Company Inc A California Corporat, Taliaferro, James E, represented by Larson, Ann H, in the jurisdiction of Amador County. This case was filed in Amador County Superior Courts with ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2012 |
CategoryCivil - Unlimited |
Last RefreshedFebruary 03, 2022 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationAmador County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Cycle Time272 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 21, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF ENTRY OF DISMISSAL AND PROOF OF SERVICE ANN H LARSON (Attorney) on behalf of JAMES E TALIAFERRO (DEFENDANT) | |
February 05, 2013 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE OF ENTIRE ACTION OF ALL PARTIES AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION ENTERED AS REQUESTED JOHN E VIRGA (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA J JOHNSON (PLAINTIFF) | |
January 15, 2013 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 225 - UNCONDITIONAL JOHN E VIRGA (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA J JOHNSON (PLAINTIFF) | |
December 10, 2012 | Docket Event |
CLERK'S MINUTES J GIRON: CLERK'S MINUTES 10010: ALEXANDRA ASTERLIN JUDGE PRO TEM BAILIFF: D. STIDGER TENTATIVE RULING: This matter is continued to FEBRUARY 25, 2013 at 1:30 P.M. in Department 3. The parties should be prepared to discuss ADR options and set a trial date at that time. New case management conference statements are required. The above tentative ruling is confirmed and ordered. |
|
December 04, 2012 | Docket Event |
HEARING SET: Event: FURTHER CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE Date: 02/25/2013 Time: 1:30 pm Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA Location: DEPT 3 Result: VACATED
Judge: ASTERLIN, ALEXANDRA |
|
November 19, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT ANN H LARSON (Attorney) on behalf of JAMES E TALIAFERRO, KELLYMOORE PAINT COMPANY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (DEFENDANT) | |
November 14, 2012 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT JOHN E VIRGA (Attorney) on behalf of DONNA J JOHNSON (PLAINTIFF) | |
November 09, 2012 | Docket Event | ADVANCE JURY FEE (NONREFUNDABLE)-SB 1021-CCP 631(B)-PLAINTIFF ANN H LARSON (Attorney) on behalf of JAMES E TALIAFERRO, KELLYMOORE PAINT COMPANY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 144465 Date: 11/09/2012 | |
July 20, 2012 | Docket Event | ANSWER TO COMPLAINT JAMES E TALIAFERRO (DEFENDANT); JAMES E TALIAFERRO (DEFENDANT); ; ANN H LARSON (Attorney) on behalf of JAMES E TALIAFERRO (DEFENDANT) Receipt: 140391 Date: 07/23/2012 | |
July 11, 2012 | Docket Event | FEE WAIVER GRANTED-ORDER ON COURT FEE WAIVER (SUPERIOR COURT) IN PRO PER (Attorney) on behalf of KELLYMOORE PAINT COMPANY INC A CALIFORNIA CORPORAT (DEFENDANT) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.