Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
The People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Gutierrez, Stephanie Ericka, in the jurisdiction of Stanislaus County. This case was filed in Stanislaus County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 07, 2005 |
CategoryTraffic: Adult Infractions |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationStanislaus County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 12, 2025 | Docket Event | Purge Pending | |
November 12, 2015 | Docket Event | Date of Payment | |
October 13, 2005 | Docket Event | Case Disposed | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Arraignment Hearing | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Release | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Muni Stat Plea | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Fees Sent To Collections | |
October 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Civil Judgment | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV Hold | |
July 14, 2005 | Docket Event | DMV Failure to Appear Abstract |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.