Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Chase Bank Usa, filed a(n) Collections - Creditor case against Russell, Carol J, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Corona, Adolfo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorona, Adolfo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management124 days |
Filing DateJuly 21, 2010 |
Category09 Unlimited - Other Collections |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCreditor |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeCollections |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time103 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2011 | Docket Event |
OSC - 3.740 Collection Case Dispo
Judge: Alvarez, Brian |
|
November 22, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
November 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. TLC Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
August 25, 2010 | Docket Event | Off calendar for OSCL hearing scheduled for 03/18/11---Hearing set in error by clerk nm | |
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 22-JUL-2010 by LESPARZA. |
|
July 22, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$355.00 was made on receipt CVCE142293. |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion le Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet le | |
July 21, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. le |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.