Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Deere & Company, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Klar, Rajuir, Gill, Surjit, in the jurisdiction of Fresno County. This case was filed in Fresno County Superior Courts with Corona, Adolfo presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCorona, Adolfo Track Judge’s New Cases |
Time To Management122 days |
Filing DateJuly 16, 2010 |
Category06 Unlimited - Breach Of Contract/Warranty |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
|
Filing LocationFresno County, CA |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time53 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 15, 2010 | Docket Event | Case Management Conference | |
September 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion Request for Dismissal filed. Action dismissed without prejudice. TLC Event: Dismissal filed. |
|
August 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
POS of summons & comp personal Proof of service of summons and first amended complaint filed showing personal service on Surjit Gill on 8-12-10. sg |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Amended document filed 1st Amended Complaint filed. gs |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons filed 1st Amended Summons on Complaint filed. gs |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Z_Conversion le Event: Civil complaint filed |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Payment A Payment of -$355.00 was made on receipt CVCE142051. |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Case Mgnt Conf Docket entry for the letter produced from CSAEVNT on 16-JUL-2010 by LESPARZA. |
|
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event | JBSIS: New Filed | |
July 16, 2010 | Docket Event |
Summons filed Summons on Complaint filed. le |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.