Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Sullivan, Ann, against Ortega, Bernardo Ramos, represented by Williamson, Kc, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Lodge, Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLodge, Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 16, 2003 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 21, 2004 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 25, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
June 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment Continued
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
June 23, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
June 19, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 16, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.