Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Da, against Tomasulo, Elizabeth Anne, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Ochoa, Frank J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOchoa, Frank J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 18, 2003 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
July 31, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
September 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
September 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied | |
September 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
September 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
September 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
August 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 15, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.