Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mckinley, Patrick J, against Pereyra, Oscar Joel, represented by Atkins, Karen, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Ochoa, Frank J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOchoa, Frank J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 06, 2004 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 08, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 27, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 27, 2004 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment Continued
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
January 06, 2004 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment Continued
Judge: DeCaro, Edward |
|
December 15, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 01, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 01, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
April 05, 2002 | Docket Event |
Modification of Sentence
Judge: Gordon, William L |
|
April 05, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.