Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Atherton, Jeanne Ann, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Talmage, Deborah presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeTalmage, Deborah Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 16, 2002 | Docket Event | Probation Referral, Issued | |
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event | Probation Order, Filed | |
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Modification of Sentence
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
December 31, 2001 | Docket Event | Defendant Waived Counsel | |
August 29, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
August 28, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 28, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant Recall, Filed | |
August 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.