Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Da, against Riggi, Philip Edward, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Ochoa, Frank J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeOchoa, Frank J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 27, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
December 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Probation Order, Filed | |
November 02, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
November 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
November 02, 2001 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied | |
November 02, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
October 04, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
September 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
August 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
August 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.