Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Glogow, Robert, against Pierce, Rodger Kent, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Lodge, Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLodge, Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 26, 2001 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 20, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Failure to Report
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
November 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
November 07, 2001 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
October 17, 2001 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
October 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
October 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
September 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Slater, Craig M |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.