Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Glogow, Robert, against Quiroz, Mark Anthony, Jr, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Gordon, William L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGordon, William L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2002 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
November 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
August 01, 2002 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
August 01, 2002 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Issue Bench/Arrest Warrant
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
August 01, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
May 22, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
April 22, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
January 28, 2002 | Docket Event | Correspondence, Sent | |
November 29, 2001 | Docket Event | Correspondence, Sent | |
August 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.