Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mcintosh, Desmond, against Henry, Shawn Randall, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with DeCaro, Edward presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDeCaro, Edward Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 09, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedNovember 20, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 19, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
June 10, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
April 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
December 20, 2001 | Docket Event | DMV Abstract Record Sent | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Charges and Direct Consequence of Plea | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Waiver of Constitutional Rights and Plea, Filed | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Privilege Against Compulsory Self-Incrimination Waived | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Court Found Plea Knowledgeable,Intelligently Made Voluntary | |
December 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.