Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Leon, Angie, filed a(n) Civil case against Salcedo, Salvador, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderle, Thomas P presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderle, Thomas P Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 29, 2001 |
CategoryCivil |
Last RefreshedMay 14, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Related Case, Filed | |
January 13, 2015 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report, Filed Filed; |
|
October 24, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order, Filed RE Visitation; Order thereon, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; 10/23/2012 Received; |
|
August 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Mediation Report, Filed Filed; |
|
July 17, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation, Filed with Family Custody Services, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
June 14, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Mediation, Filed with Family Custody Services, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
May 31, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Limited Scope Representation, Filed as to Gabriela Ferreira, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
|
February 29, 2012 | Docket Event |
Stipulation & Order, Filed re Visitation and Removal of the Requirement for a, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; Professional Supervisor; Order thereon; 02/27/2012 Received; |
|
January 20, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record, Filed Filed; Filed By Respondent; |
|
January 11, 2012 | Docket Event |
Notice, Filed of Mediation with Family Court Services, Filed; Filed By Petitioner; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.