Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bulfone, Marlene, Alfieri Luigi And Marlene Bulfone Trust, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Bartlett, Terry A, against Sexton, Mary Rose, Sexton, Austin E, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 21, 2001 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 18, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Dismissal, Filed | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Request for Full Dismissal, Filed | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Affidavit, Filed | |
December 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
November 30, 2001 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
November 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
November 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons | |
November 21, 2001 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
November 21, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.