Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Muscio, Thomas, against Cruz, Hector Bautista, represented by Sabharwal, Negar, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 07, 2003 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
October 07, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
July 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
July 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Removed From Court Control | |
July 14, 2003 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Returned | |
July 03, 2003 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
February 22, 2002 | Docket Event | Order to be Booked and Released, Filed | |
January 24, 2002 | Docket Event | Arrest Disposition Report, Sent | |
January 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Defense Counsel Concurred in Defendant's Plea or Admission |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.