Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mackinnon, John T, against Downhour, Michael Bradford, represented by Ogren, David I, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 09, 2002 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedFebruary 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event |
Restitution Hearing
Judge: Brown, Rick |
|
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
June 18, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
Restitution Hearing
Judge: Brown, Rick |
|
June 11, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 28, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 28, 2003 | Docket Event |
Restitution Hearing
Judge: Brown, Rick |
|
May 07, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
May 07, 2003 | Docket Event |
Restitution Hearing
Judge: Brown, Rick |
|
April 23, 2003 | Docket Event |
Restitution Hearing
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.