Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Plumer, Steven B, against Cantu, Janette Magdalena, represented by Scott, Michael J, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Staffel, Timothy J presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeStaffel, Timothy J Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 26, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 09, 2002 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
July 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 15, 2002 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
April 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 02, 2002 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Staffel, Timothy J |
|
April 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
March 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 26, 2002 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Garcia, Arthur A |
|
November 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Pre-Sustain Court Event
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
August 28, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.