Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Alston, Edward, Jr, against Tobar, Sara, represented by Amsbaugh, Marian, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Brown, Rick presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrown, Rick Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 08, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 19, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
November 25, 2002 | Docket Event |
Modification: Extension of Fine
Judge: Iwasko, James F |
|
November 25, 2002 | Docket Event | Pay Date Extended To | |
November 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Request to Calendar, Filed | |
October 28, 2002 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event |
Sentence/Disposition Hearing
Judge: Brown, Rick |
|
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event | Sentencing Hearing Held | |
February 04, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 22, 2002 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Readiness & Settlement
Judge: Brown, Rick |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.