Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Weiser, Sidney, against Shaw, Alex, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Hall, Diana R presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHall, Diana R Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 21, 2001 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2001 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing
Judge: Hall, Diana R |
|
April 02, 2001 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Hall, Diana R |
|
March 19, 2001 | Docket Event |
Preliminary Hearing Setting
Judge: Hall, Diana R |
|
March 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
March 14, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Flores, Rogelio |
|
March 06, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Flores, Rogelio |
|
February 21, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.