Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Velasquez, Sheila Marie, represented by Falk, Naomi M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Eskin, George C presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEskin, George C Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 28, 2002 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Compliance
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Proof of Compliance
Judge: Eskin, George C |
|
May 12, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 06, 2006 | Docket Event | Fine Comment | |
March 24, 2006 | Docket Event | FTP Notice, Mailed | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Probation Order, Filed | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Warrant: Case Restored To Court Control | |
February 14, 2006 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Eskin, George C |
|
February 06, 2002 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Non-Compliance
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.