Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hornbeck, Terry Ray, represented by Ganschow, C Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Gordon, William L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGordon, William L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 26, 2001 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Information
Judge: Dodds, Bruce W |
|
July 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
July 20, 2001 | Docket Event | Reporter's Transcript - Preliminary Examination, Filed | |
July 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Felony Minutes, Commit, Cert Form, Filed | |
June 28, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 27, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Complaint - Felony, Filed | |
June 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
June 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Declaration, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.