Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Auchincloss, Gordon, against Godfrey, Curtis, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Lodge, Joseph presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLodge, Joseph Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 22, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
September 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
August 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
August 08, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
July 25, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Slater, Craig M |
|
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
July 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
June 22, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.