Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Webb, Joshua Zane, against Zamore, Kenan, represented by Abkin, Kimberly, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Anderson, Clifford presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeAnderson, Clifford Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 22, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 13, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeDisposition |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2003 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed per PC 1203.4 | |
September 15, 2003 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Ochoa, Frank J |
|
September 15, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 04, 2003 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion, Filed | |
October 30, 2002 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte: Request/Review
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
October 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Order Terminating Deferred Entry of Judgment PC 1000, Filed | |
October 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Diversion Terminated - Proceedings Reinstated | |
July 27, 2001 | Docket Event |
Review/Request:
Judge: Loberg, Harry |
|
July 13, 2001 | Docket Event |
PC 1000 Diversion Review
Judge: Anderson, Clifford R, III |
|
June 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
PC 1000 Diversion Review
Judge: Anderson, Clifford R, III |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.