Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Mackinnon, John T, against Hernandez, Richard Carlos, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Huseman, Eugene L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuseman, Eugene L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 31, 2001 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
September 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
August 29, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered | |
August 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
August 22, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
August 15, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.