Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Webb, Joshua Zane, against Rafferty, Ward, Jr, represented by Pre Sustain Attorney, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Kuns, Kay presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKuns, Kay Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 20, 2009 |
CategoryMisdemeanor |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed per PC 1203.4 | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Case Dismissed per PC 1203.4 | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Mandatory Appearance Satisfied | |
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
Motion: Withdrawal of Plea and Dismissal per PC 1203.4
Judge: Kuns, Kay |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 20, 2009 | Docket Event | 1203.4 PC Petition/Application | |
July 18, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
July 18, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event |
Arraignment on Complaint
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.