Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Bullard, Edward H, against Rosales, Antonio, represented by Dark, Patricia A, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Iwasko, James F presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIwasko, James F Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 23, 2002 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment Continued
Judge: Dodds, Bruce W |
|
July 02, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 27, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
June 27, 2003 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Sterne, Colleen K |
|
January 24, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
January 24, 2002 | Docket Event |
Warrant Arraignment
Judge: Huseman, Eugene L |
|
January 23, 2002 | Docket Event | Request to Calendar, Filed | |
September 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Warrant, Issued | |
July 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Conviction Certified By Clerk of the Court | |
July 09, 2001 | Docket Event | Arraigned on Complaint - First Plea Entered |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.