Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Haggerty, John, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Hall, James Michael, against Perez, Regina, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Huseman, Eugene L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuseman, Eugene L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 24, 2001 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedSeptember 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2003 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed PURSUANT TO GC 68153, THIS CASE HAS BEEN DESTROYED., |
|
August 07, 2001 | Docket Event |
Writ of Possession, Issued SBA, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; Returned wholly satisfied with costs of $75.00; 07/31/2001 Issued; |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued, Filed Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 07/24/2001 Issued; |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed for Restitution of Premises, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 08/01/2001 Filed; |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed as to Regina Perez on 07-24-01 by personal service, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event |
Request for Default Judgment Possession, Filed as to Regina Perez, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; 08/01/2001 Filed; |
|
July 31, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons | |
July 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
July 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
Conversion Complaint |
|
July 24, 2001 | Docket Event |
New Filed Case Conversion Addition for Reporting |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.