Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kappler, W. Lena, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Pro Se, against Newby, Cristina M, Newby, Timothy W, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Huseman, Eugene L presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHuseman, Eugene L Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 05, 2012 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedApril 14, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2012 | Docket Event | Clerk's Note | |
August 10, 2001 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession, Issued | |
August 03, 2001 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
August 03, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons | |
August 02, 2001 | Docket Event | Request for Default Judgment Possession, Filed | |
August 01, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons Issued, Filed | |
August 01, 2001 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
July 26, 2001 | Docket Event | Conversion Service | |
July 20, 2001 | Docket Event | Conversion | |
July 20, 2001 | Docket Event | Civil Case Cover Sheet, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.