Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Waltrip, Traute, Waltrip, William E, filed a(n) Unlimited Product Liability (24) case represented by Roden, Stanley M, against Intermed Orthopedics, Inc., Sulzer Orthopedics Inc, Sulzer Orthopedics Ltd, Sulzer Medica, represented by Heyman, Ginger F, Seeger, Kenneth M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Brown, James W presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBrown, James W Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 04, 2002 |
CategoryUnlimited Product Liability (24) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 04, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order, Filed | |
May 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
March 21, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
March 15, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
February 28, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
February 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
February 08, 2002 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
February 08, 2002 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Brown, James W |
|
January 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Notice, Filed | |
January 09, 2002 | Docket Event | Coordinated Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.