Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cohn, Martin, filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Cohn, Martin P, against Simentales, Ruth, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 13, 2001 |
Category32-Unlawful Detainer-Residential Limited |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 15, 2001 | Docket Event | Writ of Execution, Issued | |
February 23, 2001 | Docket Event | Clerk Notice of Entry and Certificate of Mailing, Filed | |
February 22, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 22, 2001 | Docket Event | Request to Enter Default, Filed | |
February 22, 2001 | Docket Event | Default Judgment by Clerk, Filed | |
February 22, 2001 | Docket Event | Writ of Possession, Issued | |
February 21, 2001 | Docket Event | Order and Notice of Case Assignment, Filed | |
February 21, 2001 | Docket Event | Proof of Service - Summons & Complaint, Filed | |
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Summons | |
February 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Conversion Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.