Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mize, Jay, Mize, Jessica, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Pulverman, Martin E, against O'Brien, Karen Lindblom, represented by Patrick, Kennett M, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with deBellefeuille, Denise presiding.
Case Number |
JudgedeBellefeuille, Denise Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 31, 2001 |
CategoryUnlimited Auto (22) |
Last RefreshedAugust 28, 2021 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 23, 2002 | Docket Event |
Order, Filed re Declaration re Jury Fees, Filed; 01/22/2002 Received; |
|
December 12, 2001 | Docket Event | Trust Deposit $150.00 Trust Funds 1010 2001-12-12 Distributed Reference ID: 60942 | |
December 03, 2001 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: deBellefeuille, Denise |
|
December 03, 2001 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed CMC OFF CALENDAR, Filed; |
|
November 30, 2001 | Docket Event |
Request for Full Dismissal, Filed of Entire Action -- With Prejudice, Filed; Filed By Plaintiff; |
|
November 20, 2001 | Docket Event |
Trial Confirmation
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
November 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Readiness & Settlement Conference
Judge: McLafferty, James William |
|
November 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Minute Order, Filed R/S HELD; SETTLED; CMC 12/3/01, 8:30 AM, Filed; |
|
October 30, 2001 | Docket Event |
Brief, Filed Defendant's Settlement Conference Brief, Lodged; Filed By Defendant; Hrg 11-2-2001 Statement returned after 11/5/01 R/S ; 10/30/2001 Filed; |
|
October 29, 2001 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Statement, Received /Plaintiff, Lodged; Filed By Plaintiff; Hrg 11/5/01 130PM Dept 5 State ment returned after R/S of 11/5/01. ; |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.