Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Television Merchants Inc, filed a(n) General Family - Family case against Salazar, Eddie, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Belasco, Steven D presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBelasco, Steven D Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2001 |
CategorySmall Claims In Co 12 Or Fewer |
Last RefreshedMarch 17, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Family |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 01, 2002 | Docket Event | Order, Filed | |
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
April 05, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Judgment, Filed | |
March 01, 2001 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
March 01, 2001 | Docket Event |
Small Claims Hearing
Judge: Belasco, Steven D |
|
January 29, 2001 | Docket Event | Proof of Non-Service | |
January 25, 2001 | Docket Event | Plaintiff's Claim and Order to go to Court, Filed | |
January 25, 2001 | Docket Event | Correspondence, Received | |
January 25, 2001 | Docket Event | New Filed Case |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.