Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
People Of The State Of California, filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Sullivan, Ann, against Brown, Christopher, represented by Ganschow, C Michael, in the jurisdiction of Santa Barbara County. This case was filed in Santa Barbara County Superior Courts with Iwasko, James presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeIwasko, James Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 14, 2003 |
CategoryMisdemeanor (Purged) |
Last RefreshedMarch 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationSanta Barbara County, CA |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypePlea |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 17, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Informational Purposes
Judge: Adams, Thomas R |
|
September 17, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
September 11, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 11, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
September 10, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 10, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Hearing Setting
Judge: Lodge, Joseph |
|
September 05, 2003 | Docket Event | Minute Order, Filed | |
September 05, 2003 | Docket Event |
Probation Violation Arraignment
Judge: Talmage, Deborah |
|
September 03, 2003 | Docket Event | Request to Calendar, Filed |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.